OR HB2482 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 207, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 207, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Limits self-service fuel dispensing to low-population counties of eastern Oregon and specified counties. Removes hours of operation restriction on self-service at filling stations, service stations, garages and other dispensaries in low-population counties of eastern Oregon. Requires filling station, service station, garage or other retail dispensary in low-population county of eastern Oregon or specified county offering self-service to have attendant available for dispensing fuel during specified hours if located at site that includes retail space unrelated to certain motor vehicle goods and services. Allows nonretail facility in low-population county of eastern Oregon to allow self-service dispensing of fuel at retail.
Title
Relating to self-service fuel dispensaries in low-population counties.
Sponsors
Sen. Cliff Bentz [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 207, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 26; nays, 1--Burdick; excused, 3--Boquist, Olsen, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed.Ayes, 56; Excused, 1--Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Greenlick, Hayden, Rayfield. |
2017-03-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 30, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading. Motion to refer to Transportation Policy carried. Referred. |
2017-03-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-13 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-08 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |