OR HB2481 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Chapter 225, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits law enforcement agencies from receiving certain military surplus equipment from federal government. Prohibits law enforcement agencies from receiving certain military surplus equipment from federal government. Specifies requirements when military surplus equipment is purchased, or] requested or received by law enforcement agency. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to law enforcement equipment; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30HouseChapter 225, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-06-11HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-02SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Findley, Girod, Johnson; Excused, 1--Heard.
2021-06-01SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-01SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2021-05-20SenateWork Session held.
2021-04-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-15SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-04-12SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-09HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 9--Breese-Iverson, Evans, Holvey, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wright; Excused, 12--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseCarried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar.
2021-03-31HouseCarried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-03-30HouseSecond reading.
2021-03-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-16HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-01HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-03-01HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-22HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-29HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2481
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2481/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2481/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2481/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2481/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31472
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=514632
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32583
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=526696

Bill Comments 750

feedback