OR HB2469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows local government to inhibit or prevent production or use of seed or seed products for purpose of protecting seed or products that are not genetically engineered from adverse impacts of genetically engineered seed or products or if enforcing local measure approved by county voters on May 20, 2014.
Title
Relating to genetically engineered goods.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Barbara Warner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2469 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2469/Introduced |