OR HB2467 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 85, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 85, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Consumer and Business Services to adopt rules to regulate penalties, fees and charges that insurer imposes for early withdrawal from individual deferred annuity policy. Specifies considerations for department to use in adopting rules. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to charges in connection with withdrawals from individual deferred annuity policies; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Chapter 85, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015. |
2015-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Taylor. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 5, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 4, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2015-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-02-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |