OR HB2467 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to establish tax compliance certification program intended to provide proof of tax compliance for use in determinations of eligibility for certain public services and benefits.
Title
Relating to proof of tax compliance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-02-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |