OR HB2458 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 159, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 159, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from ad valorem property taxation property that is owned or used by cooperative for purpose of providing steam or hot water heat by combustion of biomass. Applies only to cooperative whose property is subject to central assessment, if more than 50 percent of interest in cooperative is owned by public entities whose property is exempt from ad valorem property taxation by virtue of such public ownership. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to tax exemption for property of certain cooperatives used to heat water by combustion of biomass; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 159, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Keny-Guyer, Piluso. |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |