OR HB2454 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Public Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Business and General Government Committee
Hearing: Apr 30 @ 8:30 am in HR B
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows out-of-state applicant seeking occupational license in Oregon more time to meet Oregon standards if applicant is already licensed in another state and is seeking to work in Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to regulated professions in the Eastern Oregon Border Economic Development Region.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenatePublic Hearing and Possible Work Session scheduled.
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Business and General Government.
2019-04-17SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-04-16HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Mitchell.
2019-04-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Findley. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Fahey, Holvey, Mitchell, Nosse, Piluso, Prusak, Rayfield, Sanchez, Schouten; Excused, 1--Barreto; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2019-04-15HouseSecond reading.
2019-04-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Economic Development.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback