OR HB2449 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: House Revenue Committee
Hearing: May 23 @ 8:00 am in HR A
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Increases rate of tax for emergency communications. Decreases percentage of moneys in Emergency Communications Account that may be expended for administrative costs. Increases amount of distribution from Emergency Communications Account to counties with population under 40,000.] Delays sunset on tax for emergency communications. Provides that interest from Emergency Communications Account and 9-1-1 Subaccount must be credited to 9-1-1 Subaccount.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tax for emergency communications; providing for revenue raising that requires approval by a three-fifths majority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseWork Session scheduled.
2019-04-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Revenue by prior reference.
2019-04-15HouseWithout recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-15HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Revenue.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback