OR HB2446 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Chapter 58, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-18 - Chapter 58, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Deletes prohibition against advertising by unregulated producer engaged in small-scale on-premises sale of raw milk directly to consumer.
Title
Relating to the advertising of raw milk.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-04-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-18 | House | Chapter 58, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-05-12 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-03-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Komp; Excused, 3--Buckley, Weidner, Williamson. |
2015-03-11 | House | Second reading. |
2015-03-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-03-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |