OR HB2440 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to develop and implement statewide education plan for students in early childhood through post-secondary education who are Latino or Hispanic and have experienced disproportionate educational results. Directs department to form advisory group to advise on development and implementation of plan, grant awards and rulemaking. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to statewide education plans; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] |
Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Student Success by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-29 | House | Referred to Student Success by prior reference. |
2019-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Student Success by prior reference. |
2019-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Student Success. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |