OR HB2437 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 84, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-21 - Chapter 84, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Oregon Business Development Department to enter into agreements for grants or other assistance, including but not limited to direct purchase of goods or services related to entrepreneurial and industry development. Permits Oregon Business Development Department to enter into agreements for loans,] grants or other assistance, including but not limited to direct purchase of goods or services related to entrepreneurial and industry development. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to traded sector industry development activities by the Oregon Business Development Department; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-05-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Chapter 84, (2015 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2015. |
2015-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 2, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2015-03-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |