OR HB2433 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Housing and Community Services Department to establish pilot program to provide housing for low-income seniors on school district property. Directs department to select one or more school districts to construct low-income senior housing development on property. Directs department to select one or more affordable housing providers to serve as property managers of low-income senior housing developments. Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds to finance construction of low-income senior housing development. Creates Low-Income Senior Housing Colocation Fund. Continuously appropriates moneys in fund to Housing and Community Services Department. Directs department to use moneys in fund to finance construction of low-income senior housing development. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to colocation of low-income senior housing on school district property; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-04-24HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-24HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-18HouseWork Session held.
2017-04-11HouseWork Session held.
2017-03-21HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback