OR HB2433 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 652, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 652, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to elections.
Title
Relating to elections.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 652, (2011 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2012. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-23 | President signed. | |
2011-06-23 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-17 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 49; Nays, 6--Conger, Esquivel, Garrard, Kennemer, Parrish, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Hoyle, Smith J.; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Nolan, Read, Richardson. | |
2011-06-15 | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Atkinson, Ferrioli, President Courtney. | |
2011-06-14 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-13 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-06-09 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-05-05 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-15 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-04-13 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-12 | Third reading. Carried by Berger. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Hicks. | |
2011-04-11 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-08 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-04-06 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-14 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |