OR HB2416 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs State Department of Agriculture to advance design of cannabis business certification program. Directs State Department of Agriculture to advance design of cannabis business certification program. Directs Oregon Liquor Control Commission to allocate moneys from Marijuana Control and Regulation Fund to department for purposes of cannabis business certification program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to cannabis business practices; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-09HouseWork Session held.
2021-01-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to General Government with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback