OR HB2409 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 64, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 64, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits homeowners associations from requiring application of pesticide on owner's property except as necessary for ecological or public health. Prohibits homeowners associations from requiring application of pesticide on owner's property except as necessary for ecological or public health. Requires association to notify owners, upon the owner's request, prior to pesticide application on owners' property.
Title
Relating to pesticide application within planned communities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 64, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Manning Jr. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 43; Nays, 3--Cate, Smith DB, Weber; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-29 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |