OR HB2397 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 106, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 106, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Changes name of Public Health Advisory Committee to Public Health and Pharmacy Formulary Advisory Committee. Limits term of committee members to two years. Directs State Board of Pharmacy to establish by rule formulary of drugs and devices that pharmacists may prescribe and dispense to patients under specified conditions. Directs committee to recommend drugs and devices for inclusion on formulary. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to pharmacists; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 106, (2017 Laws): Effective date May 18, 2017. |
2017-05-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Gelser. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-20 | House | Third reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Holvey, Lininger. |
2017-03-16 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |