OR HB2396 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Environmental Quality Commission to establish and implement indirect source review program. Directs Environmental Quality Commission to establish and implement indirect source review program. Directs commission to require that owner or operator of indirect source that creates or is likely to create significant air quality concern notify affected residents and businesses. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to indirect sources of air pollution; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Rep. Tom Andersen [D] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] |
Rep. Travis Nelson [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-11 | House | Referred to Climate, Energy, and Environment. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |