OR HB2392 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 710, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 710, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to issue specified types of public assistance through electronic benefits transfer card. Provides exceptions. Requires card to display names of all adults authorized to make transactions.] that is issued to replace lost or stolen card to display name of individual to whom card is issued.
Title
Relating to the statewide electronic benefits transfer system for public aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Judiciary, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Judiciary, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 710, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-07-01 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Barker, Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Hoyle, Huffman, Read, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-07-01 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-06-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-18 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary by order of Speaker and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-03-02 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, be referred to Judiciary, and then to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-02-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |