OR HB2388 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands health benefit plan coverage of childbirth and pregnancy-related health care expenses. Expands health benefit plan coverage of childbirth and pregnancy-related health care expenses. Specifies reimbursement of services provided by freestanding birthing centers. Requires Department of Consumer and Business Services to report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to health on implementation of expanded benefits. Requires that specified services related to pregnancy and childbirth be covered by state medical assistance program. Requires Oregon Health Authority to prescribe uniform payment methodology for freestanding birthing centers.
Title
Relating to reimbursement of health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2388 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2388/Introduced |