OR HB2355 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-07-18 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to develop method for recording data concerning officer-initiated pedestrian and traffic stops. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to develop training and procedures for recording data. Requires law enforcement agencies to begin recording required officer-involved pedestrian and traffic stop data beginning on date based on size of agency. Requires agencies to provide recorded data to commission beginning on date based on size of agency. Requires that data not individually identify law enforcement officers or persons who were subject of traffic stops. Requires Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to review, using statistical analysis, officer-initiated pedestrian and traffic stop data received from law enforcement agencies, and report no later than December 1, 2019, and annually thereafter, to Department of Public Safety Standards and Training, Governor and committees or interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary. Directs department to review report received from commission. Authorizes department to provide advice and technical assistance to law enforcement agency named in report. Directs department to report assistance to local public safety coordinating council in public meeting. Directs Department of State Police to develop standardized profiling complaint report form. Specifies contents of form and manner in which law enforcement agency submits form to Law Enforcement Contacts Policy and Data Review Committee. Reduces crime classification of unlawful possession of controlled substance in Schedule I. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both, except in specified circumstances. Retains current crime classification if possession is of usable quantity and is commercial drug offense, if person has prior felony conviction or two or more prior unlawful possession of controlled substance convictions, or if person possesses certain quantity of controlled substance. Reduces crime classification of unlawful possession of controlled substance in Schedule II. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both, except in specified circumstances. Retains current crime classification if possession is of usable quantity and is commercial drug offense, if person has prior felony conviction or two or more prior unlawful possession of controlled substance convictions, or if person possesses certain quantity of controlled substance. Requires county to supervise offenders convicted of certain drug-related misdemeanors. Provides that person convicted of certain drug-related misdemeanors qualifies for earned reduction in term of probation. Provides that justice courts and municipal courts do not have jurisdiction over certain drug-related misdemeanors. Reduces maximum term of imprisonment for Class A misdemeanor crime from one year to 364 days. Reduces maximum period of institutionalization or commitment, from one year to 364 days, for youth offender found to have committed act that, if committed by adult, would constitute Class A misdemeanor. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to study impact of possession of controlled substance crime classification reduction and report on results of study to committees of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary no later than September 15, 2018. Increases General Fund appropriations to commission and to Department of State Police for purposes of implementing Act. Increases expenditure limitations for Department of State Police and for Department of Public Safety Standards and Training for purposes of implementing Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public safety; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2017-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 17 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-18SenatePresident signed.
2017-07-11HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Winters. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Johnson, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher; excused, 1--Knopp.
2017-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2017-07-06SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2017-07-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2017-07-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2017-07-05HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB.
2017-07-05HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Speaker Kotek. Passed.Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Esquivel, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Lewis, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Olson, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 1--Boone.
2017-07-05HouseSecond reading.
2017-07-04HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2017-07-01HouseWork Session held.
2017-06-29HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2017-06-29HouseWork Session held.
2017-06-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-06-09HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2017-04-05HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-05HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2017-03-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2017-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB2355
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2355/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2355/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2355/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2355/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2355/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2355/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24884
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26650
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421405
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=421916

Bill Comments

feedback