OR HB2352 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on August 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-14 - Chapter 651, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates towed watersports program within State Marine Board. Requires person operating motorboat for purpose of engaging in towed watersports on specified waters of this state to hold towed watersports endorsement. Requires owners of motorboats engaged in towed watersports on specified waters of this state to hold towed watersports motorboat certificate. Punishes by maximum of $1,000 fine. Punishes second or subsequent offense within three years by maximum of $2,000 fine and requires court to order person to not operate boat for one year and to complete boating safety course. Requires court to order person to not operate boat for one year and to complete boating safety course if person is convicted of certain boating offenses within three-year period preceding date of person's current conviction. Directs State Marine Board to suspend person's towed watersports endorsement and towed watersports motorboat certificate if board receives notice from court that person has been convicted of certain boating offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to boats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-14HouseChapter 651, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
2019-08-09HouseGovernor signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-07-02HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-06-29SenateVote explanation filed by Steiner Hayward.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Steiner Hayward. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 6--Baertschiger Jr, Boles, Heard, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist.
2019-06-29SenateRules suspended. Second reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-25HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 20--Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Fahey, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, McLane, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-06-20HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-19HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-19HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-18HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2019-06-12HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-10HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-05HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources.
2019-04-11HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2019-04-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means.
2019-04-04HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-07HouseInformational Meeting held.
2019-02-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Natural Resources.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback