OR HB2352 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Internet Vendor Accountability with 11 members appointed by President of Senate, Speaker of House of Representatives, Governor, Attorney General and Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services. Requires task force to investigate practices of Internet-based vendors that require consumers to establish accounts to use vendor-provided services and that make deleting account information costly, impractical or otherwise difficult for consumers, to assess whether existing laws or consumer protection efforts by federal, state or local governments provide adequate remedies for consumers and to recommend methods and courses of action that would enable consumers to hold vendors accountable for bad practices. Sunsets December 31, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to Internet vendor accountability; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2352 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2352/Introduced |