OR HB2344 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Public Hearing held.
Pending: Senate Energy and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires persons that have responsibility for or control over packaging and labeling premoistened nonwoven disposable wipes with specified characteristics to comply with certain labeling requirements for product packaging. Requires persons that have responsibility for or control over packaging and labeling disposable cleaning cloths or similar implements] premoistened nonwoven disposable wipes with specified characteristics to comply with certain labeling requirements for product packaging. Punishes failure to comply with or violation of Act as unlawful trade practice under Unlawful Trade Practices Act.] Permits city, county or special district that provides wastewater service to enforce compliance with Act by bringing action to recover civil penalty in specified amount. Requires city, county or special district to provide alleged violator with notice of violation. Becomes operative July 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to labeling requirements for wipes; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2021-04-19SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-04-16HouseThird reading. Carried by Wilde. Passed. Ayes, 52; Nays, 1--Post; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield.
2021-04-15HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-13HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-04-08HouseWork Session held.
2021-02-09HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19HouseReferred to Water.
2021-01-11HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback