OR HB2335 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 68, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Chapter 68, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services, at request of party to proceeding to close workers' compensation claim, to appoint as many as three members to panel of medical arbiters in accordance with criteria director sets by rule.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Director of the Department of Consumer and Business Services to appoint a medical arbiters panel for workers' compensation claims.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | House | Chapter 68, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 30. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Heard. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-03-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-02-27 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |