OR HB2333 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates moneys to Oregon Innovation Council to fund grants and loans for innovation-based economic development.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Innovation Council; appropriating money.
Sponsors
Rep. Tobias Read [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-03-18 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-03-13 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |