OR HB2327 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits county juvenile department to provide preventive services to certain persons under 12 years of age. Permits county juvenile department to provide preventive services to certain persons under 12 years of age. Modifies high-risk juvenile crime prevention plan targeted population to include certain persons under 12 years of age. Creates minimum age for juvenile court jurisdiction in delinquency proceedings. Appropriates moneys to Youth Development Division for purposes of providing preventive services to certain persons under 12 years of age.
Title
Relating to children under 12 years of age who engage in delinquent behavior.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-03-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |