OR HB2327 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services, in collaboration with Oregon Health Authority, to adopt by rule specified requirements to ensure that skilled nursing facilities, residential care facilities and facilities with memory care endorsements have appropriate resources to prepare for and respond to public health emergencies. Requires Department of Human Services to study and make recommendations to interim committees of Legislative Assembly, no later than September 15, 2022, for legislative changes needed to increase access to long term care for all Oregonians.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Requires Department of Human Services, in collaboration with Oregon Health Authority, to adopt by rule specified requirements to ensure that skilled nursing facilities, residential care facilities and facilities with memory care endorsements have appropriate resources to prepare for and respond to public health emergencies. Requires department to adopt rules requiring facilities to have isolation prevention plan as part of facility's emergency response plan. Requires department to develop and update long term care rapid response plan for department staff. Requires department to provide financial assistance to facilities to purchase equipment necessary to respond to public health emergency. Creates Long Term Care Emergency Preparedness and Response Team in department to advise and consult with department in matters related to emergencies. Specifies membership. Requires department to develop training for local public health authorities in understanding responsibilities of long term care facilities and needs of residents in skilled nursing facilities, intermediate care facilities, residential care facilities and facilities with memory care endorsements. If on-site inspection is foreclosed by public health emergency, requires department to conduct virtual inspection by electronic means of long term care facilities, residential care facilities, residential training facilities and residential training homes, including facilities with memory care endorsements.
Title
Relating to long term care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On COVID-19. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |