OR HB2322 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 151, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 151, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Renames position of State Medical Examiner to Chief Medical Examiner. Changes defined term "deputy medical examiner" to "medical-legal death investigator."
Title
Relating to medical examiners.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 151, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-25 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 20; nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Lininger, Sollman. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |