OR HB2321 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 61, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 61, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from required disclosure pursuant to public records request, home address, home phone number and other specified personal information of county juvenile department employees who primarily perform duties related to youth offenders confined in detention facilities. Requires disclosure of county juvenile department employee information if public interest requires disclosure in particular instance. Adds county juvenile department employees whose duties include contact with persons committed to custody of county juvenile department to category of public employees who may use public employer address in driver or vehicle records of Department of Transportation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public records of county juvenile department employees; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Rep. Jeff Barker [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Rep. Duane Stark [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Chapter 61, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed. Ayes, 29; Excused, 1--Winters. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Carried over to 04-25 by unanimous consent. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-21 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Barreto, Leif, McLane, Witt. |
2019-03-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |