OR HB2321 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires boat operators to drain water from certain portions of boat before transporting boat within this state. Provides exceptions. Punishes by maximum fine of $250. Provides that person operating nonmotorized boat that is eight feet or more in length must obtain aquatic invasive species prevention permit. Authorizes State Marine Board to combine aquatic invasive species prevention permit with other documents that board issues. Requires person to cooperate with recommended decontamination process at check station. Punishes by maximum fine of $250. Authorizes peace officer to stop person transporting recreational or commercial watercraft and require person to drive to nearest check station if peace officer has reason to believe person failed to stop at check station. Punishes failure to comply with peace officer's directions by maximum of 30 days' imprisonment, $1,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to aquatic invasive species.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. Refer to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-26 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed.Ayes, 54; Nays, 3--Evans, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--McKeown; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Lininger, Sollman. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-02 | House | Public Hearing scheduled. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |