OR HB2309 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 49, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 49, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that progress reports of defendants lacking fitness to proceed who have been committed to state mental hospital or facility for treatment may consist of updates to original examination reports or evaluations. Provides that progress reports of defendants lacking fitness to proceed who have been committed to state mental hospital or facility for treatment may consist of updates to original examination reports or evaluations.
Title
Relating to forensic evaluations of criminal defendants.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 49, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Boquist, Monroe, Olsen. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Carried over to 05-04 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 60. |
2017-03-22 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-03-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |