OR HB2304 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Oregon Disaster Recovery Authority. Establishes Oregon Disaster Recovery Authority. Provides that Governor may activate authority when declaring emergency. Directs authority, when activated, to coordinate initial crisis services, coordinate recovery and mitigation efforts and coordinate provision of emergency aid to local governments or private entities.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Management with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2304 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2304/Introduced |