OR HB2300 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 819, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates method by which health care practitioner may offer to treat patient who has terminal disease with investigational product not approved by United States Food and Drug Administration. Provides protections, including waiver of liability, for health care practitioners, health care facilities, professional organizations or associations and manufacturers or suppliers of investigational products that comply with Act. Sunsets Act on January 2, 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to treatments for patients with terminal diseases.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-02 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 819, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-07SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-07HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-02HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 60.
2015-07-01SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-01SenateSecond reading.
2015-06-30SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.)
2015-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-26SenateReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-26SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-25SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-06-22SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-06-15SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2015-06-05SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2015-06-05SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-06-03SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-04-10SenateReferred to Health Care.
2015-04-08SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-04-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Buehler. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Hoyle.
2015-04-06HouseSecond reading.
2015-04-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2015-03-30HouseWork Session held.
2015-02-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Health Care.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2300
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2300/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2300/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2300/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2300/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2300/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2300/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21278
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=339088
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/22883
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23273
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=363871
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364137

Bill Comments

feedback