OR HB2298 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 63, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 63, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Fish and Wildlife to adopt by rule and administer program for authorizing voluntary projects for stream restoration and habitat improvement through construction of environmental restoration weirs. Directs State Department of Fish and Wildlife to adopt by rule and administer program for authorizing voluntary projects for stream restoration and habitat improvement through construction of environmental restoration weirs. Exempts authorized projects from removal-fill permit. Exempts authorized projects from fish passage requirements in certain circumstances. Authorizes department to require fish passage as part of authorized project in certain circumstances. Authorizes department to require modification of environmental restoration weirs if found to adversely impact transportation infrastructure or planned transportation infrastructure. Authorizes department to require third-party monitoring of authorized projects. Provides that certain riparian work as part of authorized project is not subject to riparian management requirements under Oregon Forest Practices Act. Requires department to adopt rules establishing program in time for rules to become operative no later than one year after effective date of Act. Requires department to submit, no later than December 31, 2027, report to interim committees related to environment and natural resources of Legislative Assembly on extent and impact of program. Requires department to submit, no later than September 15, 2032, report to interim committees related to environment and natural resources of Legislative Assembly on assessments of conditions of qualifying streams affected by authorized voluntary projects and make recommendations for legislation. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to voluntary stream restoration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Sen. Lynn Findley [R] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] |
Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Susan McLain [D] | Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Sen. David Smith [R] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Rep. Bradley Witt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 63, (2021 Laws): Effective date May 21, 2021. |
2021-05-21 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 52; Nays, 5--Fahey, Pham, Power, Rayfield, Salinas; Excused, 3--Levy, Lively, Nearman. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Golden. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 8--Anderson, Beyer, Burdick, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Helm. Passed. Ayes, 49; Nays, 9--Fahey, Holvey, Kropf, Marsh, Nathanson, Pham, Power, Rayfield, Salinas; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Clem. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over to March 31, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-29 | House | Carried over to March 30, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | House | Carried over to March 29, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-22 | House | Carried over to March 24, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-16 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Water. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |