OR HB2295 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 497, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 497, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Broadens public contracting preference for businesses that service-disabled veterans own to include all veteran-owned businesses. Broadens public contracting preference for businesses that service-disabled veterans own to include all veteran-owned businesses. Defines "veteran" and "veteran-owned business." Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to veteran-owned businesses; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-21 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 497, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Knopp. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Absent, 5--Boquist, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Carried over to 06-16 by unanimous consent. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Veterans, Emergency Management, Federal and World Affairs. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-03-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Breese-Iverson, Helfrich, Kropf, Scharf. |
2023-02-28 | House | Second reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-02-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Emergency Management, General Government, and Veterans. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |