OR HB2294 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 396, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 396, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes legislative findings regarding commercial cervid attractants as source of chronic wasting disease. Requires that commercial product that contains or is derived from cervid urine and designed for luring, attracting or enticing cervids be from herd free of chronic wasting disease.] Prohibits possession and use of commercial cervid attractants.
Title
Relating to chronic wasting disease.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-05 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 396, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-05 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Nearman. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Carried over to 05-16 by unanimous consent. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-03-05 | House | Third reading. Carried by Witt. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2019-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2019-03-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |