OR HB2292 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 46, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 46, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes defined term "rail fixed guideway system" to "rail fixed guideway public transportation system." Directs Department of Transportation to take certain actions related to state safety oversight program of rail fixed guideway public transportation systems.
Title
Relating to rail fixed guideway public transportation systems.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 46, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Olsen; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 1--Boone; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |