OR HB2289 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 648, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 648, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 648, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-27 | President signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-20 | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-17 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-17 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-13 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-13 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-10 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Garrard. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Frederick, Schaufler, Sheehan; Absent, 1--Krieger; Excused, 2--Brewer, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Richardson. | |
2011-06-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-07 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-03 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-31 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-05-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-11 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-14 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. | |
2011-04-08 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-06 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |