OR HB2287 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Failed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Garrard, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Jenson, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith G., Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Failed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Garrard, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Jenson, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith G., Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public charter schools.
Title
Relating to public charter schools.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Third reading. Carried by Wingard. Failed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 32--Bailey, Barker, Barnhart, Beyer, Boone, Buckley, Cannon, Clem, Cowan, Dembrow, Doherty, Frederick, Garrard, Garrett, Gelser, Greenlick, Harker, Holvey, Hoyle, Hunt, Jenson, Kotek, Matthews, Nathanson, Nolan, Read, Schaufler, Smith G., Smith J., Tomei, Witt, Speaker Roblan. | |
2011-03-09 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 14, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-08 | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 9, 2011 Calendar. | |
2011-03-07 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-02-28 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Education. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |