OR HB2280 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 818, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers appropriation of moneys in Oregon Growth Fund from Oregon Growth Board to Oregon Business Development Department. Authorizes department to use moneys in fund and Oregon Growth Account to pay administrative costs and for purposes related to duties and responsibilities of Oregon Growth Board. Makes Director of Oregon Business Development Department voting] ex officio nonvoting member of Oregon Growth Board. Adds two additional member] members at-large to board. Makes permissive requirement to invest certain amount in Oregon, based on moneys transferred from Oregon Growth Account or Oregon Growth Fund to management company or state agency, in accordance with rules adopted by board.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the Oregon Growth Board; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 818, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed.Ayes, 29; nays, 1--Thatcher.
2015-07-06SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2015-07-03SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-03SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-07-03HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed.Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Whitsett.
2015-07-03HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-07-01HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-07-01HouseWork Session held.
2015-07-01HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-06-17HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-05-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development.
2015-02-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-02-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-02-18HouseWork Session held.
2015-02-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2280
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2280/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2280/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2280/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2280/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2280/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2280/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/20833
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23443
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364645
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365083

Bill Comments

feedback