OR HB2279 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Recommendation: Do pass.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals residency requirement in Oregon Death with Dignity Act. Repeals residency requirement in Oregon Death with Dignity Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to death with dignity; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2023-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-05-10SenateWork Session held.
2023-04-19SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-27SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-03-21SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2023-03-21HouseThird reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 35; Nays, 21--Boice, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Cramer, Diehl, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, Lewis, Mannix, McIntire, Morgan, Osborne, Owens, Scharf, Stout, Wallan; Excused, 4--Nelson, Reschke, Smith G, Wright.
2023-03-20HouseSecond reading.
2023-03-16HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2023-03-13HouseWork Session held.
2023-01-23HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-11HouseReferred to Behavioral Health and Health Care.
2023-01-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB2279
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2279/Introduced
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24834
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75404
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/65252
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75372
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75715
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/258996
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/258868
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264443
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264444
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264445
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270153
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271048
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/271147
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273413
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79374
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34549
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=564844
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35718

Bill Comments

feedback