OR HB2279 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 44, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 44, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transfers to Department of Revenue sole authority for examining and registering property appraisers and setting education and experience requirements. Consolidates Property Appraiser I, II and III classifications into single Property Appraiser classification. Eliminates general knowledge examination requirement. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to registration of appraisers; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 44, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Barnhart. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Evans, Sprenger, Stark. |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 7, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-02 | House | Second reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2017-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2017-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |