OR HB2279 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 731, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-14 - Chapter 731, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows employees of local governments to participate in benefit plans provided by Public Employees' Benefit Board and Oregon Educators Benefit Board.
Title
Relating to participation of employees of local governments in certain benefit plans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-14 | House | Chapter 731, (2013 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2014. |
2013-08-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed. Ayes, 16; nays, 14--Baertschiger, Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Olsen, Starr, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Carried over to 07-01 by unanimous consent. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 14--Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Gelser, Gilliam, Hanna, Johnson, Parrish, Sprenger, Thatcher, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Unger. |
2013-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-02-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |