OR HB2278 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 815, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies schedule and conditions for issuance of lottery bonds to pay costs of Coos Bay Channel Project. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to public borrowing for Coos Bay channel project; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 815, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-06SenateGelser, Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest.
2015-07-06SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Roblan. Passed.Ayes, 30.
2015-07-06SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-06SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2015-07-06SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-07-06SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-07-06HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by McKeown. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Buehler.
2015-07-06HouseSecond reading.
2015-07-06HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-07-03HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-07-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-07-03HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2015-04-08HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-08HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-06HouseWork Session held.
2015-03-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-01-16HouseReferred to Transportation and Economic Development with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2015-01-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2278
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2278/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2278/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2278/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2278/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2278/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2278/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21433
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23449
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365017
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=365081

Bill Comments

feedback