OR HB2275 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 43, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 43, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
For purposes of corporate tax apportionment, redefines income subject to apportionment to align with Multistate Tax Commission model. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to income that is apportionable for corporate tax purposes; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | House | Chapter 43, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-05-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Carried over to 05-03 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-03-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Boone, Gorsek, Stark. |
2017-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to March 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-03-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-02-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-02-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |