OR HB2257 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 646, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 646, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the voters' pamphlet; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the voters' pamphlet; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 646, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-29 | President signed. | |
2011-06-29 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-27 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 44; Absent, 1--Hicks; Excused, 1--Hoyle; Excused for Business of the House, 14--Beyer, Buckley, Cowan, Freeman, Garrard, Komp, Kotek, McLane, Nathanson, Nolan, Richardson, Smith G., Thatcher, Whisnant. | |
2011-06-23 | Third reading. Carried by Rosenbaum. Passed. Ayes, 27; nays, 1--Atkinson; excused, 2--Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-22 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-07 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-07 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-06 | Third reading. Carried by Smith G.. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Barker; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. | |
2011-06-01 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-05-27 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-23 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-05-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-17 | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to refer to Ways and Means carried. Referred. | |
2011-05-04 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-05-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-05-02 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-11 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |