OR HB2244 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 645, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 645, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public records; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to public records; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 645, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-07-19 | President signed. | |
2011-07-05 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-29 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-29 | Vote reconsideration carried. Ayes, 60. | |
2011-06-28 | Hunt changed vote from "aye" to "nay" and served notice of possible reconsideration. | |
2011-06-28 | House refused to concur in Senate amendments. Ayes, 28; Nays, 31--Barker, Bentz, Cameron, Conger, Esquivel, Freeman, Garrard, Gilliam, Hicks, Huffman, Hunt, Jenson, Johnson, Kennemer, Krieger, Lindsay, Matthews, McLane, Olson, Parrish, Schaufler, Sheehan, Smith G., Sprenger, Thatcher, Thompson, Wand, Weidner, Whisnant, Wingard, Speaker Hanna; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Richardson. | |
2011-06-10 | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Bates, Telfer, Verger. | |
2011-06-09 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-08 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to General Government, Consumer and Small Business Protection. | |
2011-04-25 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-04-21 | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Frederick, Kennemer. | |
2011-04-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-04-18 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-04-12 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-31 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-10 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to General Government and Consumer Protection. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |