OR HB2241 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes Chief Justice of the Supreme Court to collect fees from certain public bodies for use of certain state court technology services. Authorizes Chief Justice of the Supreme Court to impose fees on] collect fees from certain public bodies for use of certain electronic] state court technology services. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state court technology fees; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-30SenateAt Desk upon adjournment.
2019-06-30SenateSecond reading.
2019-06-29SenateRecommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill.
2019-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2019-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2019-06-24HouseThird reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 28--Barker, Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Gorsek, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McKeown, McLane, Mitchell, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reardon, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused, 1--Clem.
2019-06-20HouseSecond reading.
2019-06-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-12HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-12HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-04HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety.
2019-04-01HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-01HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-03-25HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-01-18HouseReferred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-01-14HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback