OR HB2231 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 157, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Chapter 157, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides right to collectively bargain with State of Oregon to health care interpreters . Provides right to collectively bargain with State of Oregon to health care interpreters who receive compensation paid by state for providing interpretation services].
Title
Relating to interpreter collective bargaining.
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] |
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | House | Chapter 157, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 5--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, Girod, Linthicum, Thomsen; Excused, 3--Johnson, Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Workforce. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-04-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 21--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |