OR HB2229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to establish and administer pilot program to assist school districts in providing age-appropriate instruction on natural disasters. Requires school districts to provide instruction and drills on how to prepare for and survive after natural disaster.] Directs Department of Education to develop curriculum relating to earthquake and tsunami safety. Requires school districts to implement curriculum unless districts provide written notice to State Resilience Officer.] Sunsets pilot program on January 2, 2025. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to emergency preparedness education; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Caddy McKeown [D] | Rep. Tiffiny Mitchell [D] |
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-09 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2019-04-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-18 | House | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-01-14 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |